House | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 4073 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4073 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3719 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2511 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2406 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2406 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2406 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2406 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2406 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2405 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2405 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hegar | Journal Page: 2405 |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2405 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2405 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2139 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1413 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1413 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1384 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |