House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 3436 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3436 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3174 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2308 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2215 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2215 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2215 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2215 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2215 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2215 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2215 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |