E | 05/27/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/27/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4093 | |
E | 05/19/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2568 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4073 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2534 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2568 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#875 | Journal Page: 3723 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3723 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3723 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3686 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3686 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB603 | Journal Page: 3686 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3679 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2425 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2425 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2133 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1874 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1734 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1734 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1734 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1733 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1733 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1733 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1733 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Patrick | Journal Page: 1733 |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1733 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1733 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 222 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 222 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |