House | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3436 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3436 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3439 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2395 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2318 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2318 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2318 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2318 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2318 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2318 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2317 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2193 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |