E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5158
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4512
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4133
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1376
|
Journal Page: 5145
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5145
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5145
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5104
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5104
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4355
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2208
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2208
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2208
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2208
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2096
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|