1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 2569 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the governing body of the Willacy County Navigation |
---|
6 | 6 | | District. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 404, Acts of the 53rd Legislature, |
---|
9 | 9 | | Regular Session, 1953, is amended by adding Sections 1A, 1B, and 1C |
---|
10 | 10 | | to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 1A. In this Act: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (1) "Board" means the board of navigation and canal |
---|
13 | 13 | | commissioners of the district. |
---|
14 | 14 | | (2) "Commissioner" means a member of the board. |
---|
15 | 15 | | (3) "District" means the Willacy County Navigation |
---|
16 | 16 | | District. |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 1B. (a) The board shall divide the territory of the |
---|
18 | 18 | | district into four numbered single-member districts for electing |
---|
19 | 19 | | commissioners. |
---|
20 | 20 | | (b) The board may revise the single-member districts as |
---|
21 | 21 | | necessary or appropriate. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (c) The board consists of five commissioners. One |
---|
23 | 23 | | commissioner is elected from each single-member district, and one |
---|
24 | 24 | | commissioner is elected from the district at large. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (d) Commissioners serve staggered four-year terms. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (e) The commissioner elected from the district at large |
---|
27 | 27 | | serves as the presiding officer of the board. |
---|
28 | 28 | | Sec. 1C. The board shall hold an election to elect the |
---|
29 | 29 | | appropriate number of commissioners on the uniform election date in |
---|
30 | 30 | | November of each even-numbered year. |
---|
31 | 31 | | SECTION 2. (a) In this section, "board," "commissioner," |
---|
32 | 32 | | and "district" have the meanings assigned by Section 1A, Chapter |
---|
33 | 33 | | 404, Acts of the 53rd Legislature, Regular Session, 1953, as added |
---|
34 | 34 | | by this Act. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (b) Not later than June 1, 2010, the board shall divide the |
---|
36 | 36 | | territory of the district into four numbered single-member |
---|
37 | 37 | | districts as required by Section 1B, Chapter 404, Acts of the 53rd |
---|
38 | 38 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 1953, as added by this Act. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (c) A commissioner of the district who is serving on the day |
---|
40 | 40 | | before the effective date of this Act shall serve until a successor |
---|
41 | 41 | | qualifies following an election under Subsection (d) of this |
---|
42 | 42 | | section. |
---|
43 | 43 | | (d) On the uniform election date in November 2010, the board |
---|
44 | 44 | | shall hold an election to elect one at-large commissioner and four |
---|
45 | 45 | | commissioners from single-member districts. |
---|
46 | 46 | | (e) The five commissioners elected under Subsection (d) of |
---|
47 | 47 | | this section shall draw lots to determine which two commissioners |
---|
48 | 48 | | shall serve a term expiring December 1, 2012, and which three |
---|
49 | 49 | | commissioners shall serve a term expiring December 1, 2014. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (f) On the uniform election date in November 2012, the board |
---|
51 | 51 | | shall hold an election to elect two commissioners to terms of four |
---|
52 | 52 | | years. |
---|
53 | 53 | | (g) On the uniform election date in 2014, the board shall |
---|
54 | 54 | | hold an election to elect three commissioners to terms of four |
---|
55 | 55 | | years. |
---|
56 | 56 | | SECTION 3. (a) The legal notice of the intention to |
---|
57 | 57 | | introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this |
---|
58 | 58 | | Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a |
---|
59 | 59 | | copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies, |
---|
60 | 60 | | officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished |
---|
61 | 61 | | under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313, |
---|
62 | 62 | | Government Code. |
---|
63 | 63 | | (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has |
---|
64 | 64 | | submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on |
---|
65 | 65 | | Environmental Quality. |
---|
66 | 66 | | (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed |
---|
67 | 67 | | its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the |
---|
68 | 68 | | lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of |
---|
69 | 69 | | representatives within the required time. |
---|
70 | 70 | | (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this |
---|
71 | 71 | | state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect |
---|
72 | 72 | | to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled |
---|
73 | 73 | | and accomplished. |
---|
74 | 74 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
75 | 75 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
76 | 76 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
77 | 77 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
78 | 78 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
79 | 79 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
80 | 80 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
81 | 81 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2569 passed the Senate on |
---|
82 | 82 | | May 11, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the |
---|
83 | 83 | | Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the |
---|
84 | 84 | | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
85 | 85 | | ______________________________ |
---|
86 | 86 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
87 | 87 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2569 passed the House, with |
---|
88 | 88 | | amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, |
---|
89 | 89 | | Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
90 | 90 | | ______________________________ |
---|
91 | 91 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
92 | 92 | | Approved: |
---|
93 | 93 | | ______________________________ |
---|
94 | 94 | | Date |
---|
95 | 95 | | ______________________________ |
---|
96 | 96 | | Governor |
---|