House | 05/15/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3800 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3800 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3678 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2442 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2383 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2383 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2383 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2382 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2382 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2382 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2382 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Watson | Journal Page: 2382 |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2382 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2382 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2193 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2013 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1993 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1993 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1988 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |