House | 05/23/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4569 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4219 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2725 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2596 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2596 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2596 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2596 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2595 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2595 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2595 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Uresti | Journal Page: 2595 |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2595 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2595 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2358 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2089 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2089 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 2089 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |