Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2577 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Jackson S.B. No. 2577
 (In the Senate - Filed May 6, 2009; May 6, 2009, read first
 time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; May 12, 2009,
 reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 2;
 May 12, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to bariatric surgery coverage for state employees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 1551, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1551.225 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1551.225.  BARIATRIC SURGERY COVERAGE. (a)  The board
 of trustees shall develop a cost-neutral or cost-positive plan for
 providing under the group benefits program bariatric surgery
 coverage for employees eligible to participate in the program under
 Section 1551.101.
 (b)  The board of trustees may adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 2. The board of trustees of the Employees
 Retirement System of Texas shall implement the plan required by
 Section 1551.225, Insurance Code, as added by this Act, as soon as
 practicable, but not later than September 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *