Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2577 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2577


 AN ACT
 relating to bariatric surgery coverage for state employees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 1551, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1551.225 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1551.225.  BARIATRIC SURGERY COVERAGE. (a)  The board
 of trustees shall develop a cost-neutral or cost-positive plan for
 providing under the group benefits program bariatric surgery
 coverage for employees eligible to participate in the program under
 Section 1551.101.
 (b)  The board of trustees may adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 2. The board of trustees of the Employees
 Retirement System of Texas shall implement the plan required by
 Section 1551.225, Insurance Code, as added by this Act, as soon as
 practicable, but not later than September 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2577 passed the Senate on
 May 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2577 passed the House on
 May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 5, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor