House | 05/21/2009 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4074 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2617 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2521 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2521 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2521 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2520 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2520 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2520 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2520 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2394 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2090 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2090 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 2089 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |