House | 05/20/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 4073 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4073 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3952 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2568 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2492 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2492 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2492 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2492 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2491 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2491 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Patrick | Journal Page: 2491 |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2491 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2491 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2491 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2394 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2357 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 2356 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 2356 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2301 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2301 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 2301 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |