House | 05/27/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 5123 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4093 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2511 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2440 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 2392 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2392 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 2392 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |