Senate | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Referred to s/c by chair | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |