House | 05/23/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4078 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2206 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2206 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1415 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1334 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1334 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1334 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1333 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1333 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1333 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1333 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Ogden | Journal Page: 1333 |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1332 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1332 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1144 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1140 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 234 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 222 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 222 | |
Senate | 11/12/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |