Senate | 03/26/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 384 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 352 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 316 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 288 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 223 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 223 | |
Senate | 11/12/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |