81R1174 JD-D By: Patrick, Dan S.B. No. 276 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the determination of the appraised value of a residence homestead for ad valorem taxation. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 23.23(a), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) Except as provided by [Notwithstanding the requirements of] Section 25.18 [and regardless of whether the appraisal office has appraised the property and determined the market value of the property for the tax year], an appraisal office may increase the appraised value of a residence homestead for a tax year to an amount not to exceed the lesser of: (1) the market value of the property for the most recent tax year that the market value was determined by the appraisal office; or (2) the sum of: (A) 10 percent of the appraised value of the property for the preceding tax year; (B) the appraised value of the property for the preceding tax year; and (C) the market value of all new improvements to the property. SECTION 2. Section 25.18, Tax Code, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and (b-3) to read as follows: (b) The plan shall provide for the following reappraisal activities for all real and personal property in the district at least once every three years, except as provided by Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and (b-3): (1) identifying properties to be appraised through physical inspection or by other reliable means of identification, including deeds or other legal documentation, aerial photographs, land-based photographs, surveys, maps, and property sketches; (2) identifying and updating relevant characteristics of each property in the appraisal records; (3) defining market areas in the district; (4) identifying property characteristics that affect property value in each market area, including: (A) the location and market area of property; (B) physical attributes of property, such as size, age, and condition; (C) legal and economic attributes; and (D) easements, covenants, leases, reservations, contracts, declarations, special assessments, ordinances, or legal restrictions; (5) developing an appraisal model that reflects the relationship among the property characteristics affecting value in each market area and determines the contribution of individual property characteristics; (6) applying the conclusions reflected in the model to the characteristics of the properties being appraised; and (7) reviewing the appraisal results to determine value. (b-1) The plan shall provide for the reappraisal of a residence homestead not more often than once every two years. The appraised value of a residence homestead may not be increased for a tax year in which the property is not appraised. (b-2) Subsection (b-1) does not apply to the appraisal of a residence homestead in the tax year in which a limitation on appraised value under Section 23.23(a) expires. (b-3) Notwithstanding Subsection (b-1), at any time during a tax year before the date the chief appraiser certifies the appraisal roll for the appraisal district, an owner of a residence homestead is entitled to a reappraisal of the owner's residence homestead for that year on written request delivered to the chief appraiser. SECTION 3. Section 403.302(d), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (d) For the purposes of this section, "taxable value" means the market value of all taxable property less: (1) the total dollar amount of any residence homestead exemptions lawfully granted under Section 11.13(b) or (c), Tax Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each school district; (2) one-half of the total dollar amount of any residence homestead exemptions granted under Section 11.13(n), Tax Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each school district; (3) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted before May 31, 1993, within a reinvestment zone under agreements authorized by Chapter 312, Tax Code; (4) subject to Subsection (e), the total dollar amount of any captured appraised value of property that: (A) is within a reinvestment zone created on or before May 31, 1999, or is proposed to be included within the boundaries of a reinvestment zone as the boundaries of the zone and the proposed portion of tax increment paid into the tax increment fund by a school district are described in a written notification provided by the municipality or the board of directors of the zone to the governing bodies of the other taxing units in the manner provided by Section 311.003(e), Tax Code, before May 31, 1999, and within the boundaries of the zone as those boundaries existed on September 1, 1999, including subsequent improvements to the property regardless of when made; (B) generates taxes paid into a tax increment fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code, under a reinvestment zone financing plan approved under Section 311.011(d), Tax Code, on or before September 1, 1999; and (C) is eligible for tax increment financing under Chapter 311, Tax Code; (5) for a school district for which a deduction from taxable value is made under Subdivision (4), an amount equal to the taxable value required to generate revenue when taxed at the school district's current tax rate in an amount that, when added to the taxes of the district paid into a tax increment fund as described by Subdivision (4)(B), is equal to the total amount of taxes the district would have paid into the tax increment fund if the district levied taxes at the rate the district levied in 2005; (6) the total dollar amount of any captured appraised value of property that: (A) is within a reinvestment zone: (i) created on or before December 31, 2008, by a municipality with a population of less than 18,000; and (ii) the project plan for which includes the alteration, remodeling, repair, or reconstruction of a structure that is included on the National Register of Historic Places and requires that a portion of the tax increment of the zone be used for the improvement or construction of related facilities or for affordable housing; (B) generates school district taxes that are paid into a tax increment fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code; and (C) is eligible for tax increment financing under Chapter 311, Tax Code; (7) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted under Section 11.251 or 11.253, Tax Code; (8) the difference between the comptroller's estimate of the market value and the productivity value of land that qualifies for appraisal on the basis of its productive capacity, except that the productivity value estimated by the comptroller may not exceed the fair market value of the land; (9) the portion of the appraised value of residence homesteads of individuals who receive a tax limitation under Section 11.26, Tax Code, on which school district taxes are not imposed in the year that is the subject of the study, calculated as if the residence homesteads were appraised at the full value required by law; (10) a portion of the market value of property not otherwise fully taxable by the district at market value because of: (A) action required by statute or the constitution of this state that, if the tax rate adopted by the district is applied to it, produces an amount equal to the difference between the tax that the district would have imposed on the property if the property were fully taxable at market value and the tax that the district is actually authorized to impose on the property, if this subsection does not otherwise require that portion to be deducted; or (B) action taken by the district under Subchapter B or C, Chapter 313, Tax Code; (11) the market value of all tangible personal property, other than manufactured homes, owned by a family or individual and not held or used for the production of income; (12) the appraised value of property the collection of delinquent taxes on which is deferred under Section 33.06, Tax Code; (13) the portion of the appraised value of property the collection of delinquent taxes on which is deferred under Section 33.065, Tax Code; [and] (14) the amount by which the market value of a residence homestead to which Section 23.23, Tax Code, applies exceeds the appraised value of that property as calculated under that section; and (15) the amount by which the market value of a residence homestead to which Section 25.18(b-1), Tax Code, applies exceeds the appraised value of that property because of the application of Section 25.18(b-1). SECTION 4. This Act applies only to the determination of the appraised value of a residence homestead for ad valorem taxation for a tax year that begins on or after the effective date of this Act. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010.