E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5980
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4512
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4178
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4178
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4178
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4173
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3189
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1183
|
Journal Page: 4792
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4792
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4792
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4328
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Aycock
|
Journal Page: 4328
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4328
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3953
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1011
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1011
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 644
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 807
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 642
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 603
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 603
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 603
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 603
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 603
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 603
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 603
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 500
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 363
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 224
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 224
|
Senate
|
11/12/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|