Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB281 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 281
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 6, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 6, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the confidentiality of the home address information of
 the spouses of certain federal judges and certain state judges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Section 13.0021, Election Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b) If the registration applicant is a federal judge, a [or]
 state judge or the spouse of a state judge or a federal judge who
 seeks to have the applicant's residence address omitted from the
 registration list, the applicant shall include with the application
 an affidavit stating that the applicant is a federal judge or state
 judge or the spouse of a federal judge or state judge.
 SECTION 2. Subsections (c) and (d), Sections 13.004,
 Election Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (c) The following information furnished on a registration
 application is confidential and does not constitute public
 information for purposes of Chapter 552, Government Code:
 (1) a social security number;
 (2) a Texas driver's license number;
 (3) a number of a personal identification card issued
 by the Department of Public Safety;
 (4) an indication that an applicant is interested in
 working as an election judge; or
 (5) the residence address of the applicant, if the
 applicant is a federal judge or state judge, as defined by Section
 13.0021, or the spouse of a federal judge or state judge, and
 included an affidavit with the registration application under
 Section 13.0021 or the registrar has received an affidavit
 submitted under Section 15.0215.
 (d) The voter registrar or other county official who has
 access to the information furnished on a registration application
 may not post the following information on a website:
 (1) a telephone number;
 (2) a social security number;
 (3) a driver's license number or a number of a personal
 identification card;
 (4) a date of birth; or
 (5) the residence address of a voter who is a federal
 judge or state judge, as defined by Section 13.0021, or the spouse
 of a federal judge or state judge, if the voter included an
 affidavit with the application under Section 13.0021 or the
 registrar has received an affidavit submitted under Section
 15.0215.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (b), Section 15.0215, Election Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b) A federal judge, a [or] state judge or the spouse of a
 federal judge or state judge who is registered to vote may at any
 time submit to the registrar of the county in which the judge
 resides an affidavit stating that the voter is a federal judge or
 state judge or the spouse of a federal judge or state judge.
 SECTION 4. Subsection (d), Section 15.081, Election Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (d) Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the suspense list may
 not contain the residence address of a voter who is a federal judge,
 a [or] state judge, or the spouse of a federal judge or state judge,
 if the voter included an affidavit with the voter's registration
 application under Section 13.0021 or the registrar received an
 affidavit submitted under Section 15.0215 before the list was
 prepared. In this subsection, "federal judge" and "state judge"
 have the meanings assigned by Section 13.0021.
 SECTION 5. Subsection (c), Section 18.005, Election Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c) The original or supplemental list of registered voters
 may not contain the residence address of a voter who is a federal
 judge, a [or] state judge, or the spouse of a federal judge or state
 judge, if the voter included an affidavit with the voter's
 registration application under Section 13.0021 or the registrar
 received an affidavit submitted under Section 15.0215 before the
 list was prepared. In this subsection, "federal judge" and "state
 judge" have the meanings assigned by Section 13.0021.
 SECTION 6. Subsection (b), Section 18.066, Election Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b) Information furnished under this section may not
 include:
 (1) a voter's social security number; or
 (2) the residence address of a voter who is a federal
 judge or state judge, as defined by Section 13.0021, or the spouse
 of a federal judge or state judge, if the voter included an
 affidavit with the voter's registration application under Section
 13.0021 or the applicable registrar has received an affidavit
 submitted under Section 15.0215.
 SECTION 7. Subsection (a), Section 25.025, Tax Code, as
 amended by Chapters 594 (H.B. 41), 621 (H.B. 455), and 851 (H.B.
 1141), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is
 reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 (a) This section applies only to:
 (1) a current or former peace officer as defined by
 Article 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure;
 (2) a county jailer as defined by Section 1701.001,
 Occupations Code;
 (3) an employee of the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice;
 (4) a commissioned security officer as defined by
 Section 1702.002, Occupations Code;
 (5) a victim of family violence as defined by Section
 71.004, Family Code, if as a result of the act of family violence
 against the victim, the actor is convicted of a felony or a Class A
 misdemeanor; [and]
 (6) a federal judge, a [or] state judge, or the spouse
 of a federal judge or state judge;
 (7) [(6)] a current or former employee of a district
 attorney, criminal district attorney, or county or municipal
 attorney whose jurisdiction includes any criminal law or child
 protective services matters; and
 (8) [(6)] an officer or employee of a community
 supervision and corrections department established under Chapter
 76, Government Code, who performs a duty described by Section
 76.004(b) of that code.
 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *