House | 05/18/2009 | Postponed | 5/22/09 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3914 |
House | 05/18/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3914 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1011 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1011 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 363 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 224 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 224 | |
Senate | 11/12/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |