Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB287 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS     Senate Research Center S.B. 287 81R2339 UM-D By: Nelson  Health & Human Services  2/20/2009  As Filed     AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   The Texas Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) is statutorily required to make efforts to use technology to streamline the Medicaid program and reduce paperwork, including the use of the electronic prescriptions. Though statutorily required to make efforts to use electronic prescriptions, HHSC does not.   As proposed,  S.B. 287 requires HHSC to develop and implement a plan to encourage Medicaid providers to use electronic prescribing.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 531.02411, Government Code, as follows:   Sec. 531.02411. STREAMLINING ADMINISTRATIVE PROCESSES. (a) Creates this subsection from existing text.   (b) Requires the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to develop and implement a plan designed to encourage the increased use by Medicaid providers of the medical technology described by Subsection (a)(6)(B) (relating to certain electronic prescribing tools). Requires that the plan include a goal of achieving by September 1, 2014, a specified percentage increase in the use of electronic prescribing by Medicaid providers. Requires HHSC, not later than January 1, 2010, to submit a report to the legislature describing the plan developed by HHSC in accordance with this subsection. Requires HHSC, not later than January 1, 2011, and January 1, 2013, to submit a report to the legislature regarding the implementation and results of the plan. Provides that this subsection expires September 1, 2014.   SECTION 2. Requires HHSC, if necessary for implementation of a provision of this Act, to request a waiver or authorization from a federal agency, and authorizes delay of implementation until such waivers or authorizations are granted.    SECTION 3. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009. 

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 287

81R2339 UM-D By: Nelson

 Health & Human Services

 2/20/2009

 As Filed

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

The Texas Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) is statutorily required to make efforts to use technology to streamline the Medicaid program and reduce paperwork, including the use of the electronic prescriptions. Though statutorily required to make efforts to use electronic prescriptions, HHSC does not.

 

As proposed,  S.B. 287 requires HHSC to develop and implement a plan to encourage Medicaid providers to use electronic prescribing.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Section 531.02411, Government Code, as follows:

 

Sec. 531.02411. STREAMLINING ADMINISTRATIVE PROCESSES. (a) Creates this subsection from existing text.

 

(b) Requires the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to develop and implement a plan designed to encourage the increased use by Medicaid providers of the medical technology described by Subsection (a)(6)(B) (relating to certain electronic prescribing tools). Requires that the plan include a goal of achieving by September 1, 2014, a specified percentage increase in the use of electronic prescribing by Medicaid providers. Requires HHSC, not later than January 1, 2010, to submit a report to the legislature describing the plan developed by HHSC in accordance with this subsection. Requires HHSC, not later than January 1, 2011, and January 1, 2013, to submit a report to the legislature regarding the implementation and results of the plan. Provides that this subsection expires September 1, 2014.

 

SECTION 2. Requires HHSC, if necessary for implementation of a provision of this Act, to request a waiver or authorization from a federal agency, and authorizes delay of implementation until such waivers or authorizations are granted. 

 

SECTION 3. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.