Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB287 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Nelson S.B. No. 287
22
33
44 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
55 AN ACT
66 relating to the use of electronic prescribing data transmission
77 systems under the state Medicaid program.
88 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
99 SECTION 1. Section 531.02411, Government Code, is amended
1010 to read as follows:
1111 Sec. 531.02411. STREAMLINING ADMINISTRATIVE PROCESSES.
1212 (a) The commission shall make every effort using the commission's
1313 existing resources to reduce the paperwork and other administrative
1414 burdens placed on Medicaid recipients and providers and other
1515 participants in the Medicaid program and shall use technology and
1616 efficient business practices to decrease those burdens. In
1717 addition, the commission shall make every effort to improve the
1818 business practices associated with the administration of the
1919 Medicaid program by any method the commission determines is
2020 cost-effective, including:
2121 (1) expanding the utilization of the electronic claims
2222 payment system;
2323 (2) developing an Internet portal system for prior
2424 authorization requests;
2525 (3) encouraging Medicaid providers to submit their
2626 program participation applications electronically;
2727 (4) ensuring that the Medicaid provider application is
2828 easy to locate on the Internet so that providers may conveniently
2929 apply to the program;
3030 (5) working with federal partners to take advantage of
3131 every opportunity to maximize additional federal funding for
3232 technology in the Medicaid program; and
3333 (6) encouraging the increased use of medical
3434 technology by providers, including increasing their use of:
3535 (A) electronic communications between patients
3636 and their physicians or other health care providers;
3737 (B) electronic prescribing tools that provide
3838 up-to-date payer formulary information at the time a physician or
3939 other health care practitioner writes a prescription and that
4040 support the electronic transmission of a prescription;
4141 (C) ambulatory computerized order entry systems
4242 that facilitate physician and other health care practitioner orders
4343 at the point of care for medications and laboratory and
4444 radiological tests;
4545 (D) inpatient computerized order entry systems
4646 to reduce errors, improve health care quality, and lower costs in a
4747 hospital setting;
4848 (E) regional data-sharing to coordinate patient
4949 care across a community for patients who are treated by multiple
5050 providers; and
5151 (F) electronic intensive care unit technology to
5252 allow physicians to fully monitor hospital patients remotely.
5353 (b) The commission shall develop and implement a plan
5454 designed to encourage the increased use by Medicaid providers of
5555 the medical technology described by Subsection (a)(6)(B). The plan
5656 must include a goal of achieving by September 1, 2014, a specified
5757 percentage increase in the use of electronic prescribing by
5858 Medicaid providers. Not later than January 1, 2010, the commission
5959 shall submit a report to the legislature describing the plan
6060 developed by the commission in accordance with this subsection.
6161 Not later than January 1, 2011, and January 1, 2013, the commission
6262 shall submit a report to the legislature regarding the
6363 implementation and results of the plan. This subsection expires
6464 September 1, 2014.
6565 SECTION 2. If before implementing any provision of this Act
6666 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
6767 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
6868 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
6969 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
7070 waiver or authorization is granted.
7171 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7272 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
7373 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
7474 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
7575 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.