Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB291 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 291
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 2, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 March 2, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 291 By: Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to hepatitis B vaccination for students enrolled in
 certain health-related courses of study at an institution of higher
 education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 51.933, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A rule adopted under Subsection (b) that requires a
 hepatitis B vaccination for students may apply only to students
 enrolled in a course of study that involves potential exposure to
 human or animal blood or bodily fluids.
 SECTION 2. Not later than November 1, 2009, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt rules as required by Section (b-1), Section 51.933, Education
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *