E | 05/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2617 | |
E | 05/07/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2140 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2867 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2117 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2140 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2058 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2459 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | RV#544 | Journal Page: 2460 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2460 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2460 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2443 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2443 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB2738 | Journal Page: 2443 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1012 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1012 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 438 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 225 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 225 | |
Senate | 11/13/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/13/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |