Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB297 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 297


 AN ACT
 relating to resident tuition rates and fees at public institutions
 of higher education for certain veterans and servicemembers and
 their spouses and children.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 54.058, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (k) and (l) to read as follows:
 (k)  A person is entitled to pay tuition and fees at an
 institution of higher education at the rates provided for Texas
 residents without regard to the length of time the person has
 resided in this state if the person files with the institution at
 which the person intends to register a letter of intent to establish
 residence in this state and resides in this state while enrolled in
 the institution and the person:
 (1)  is eligible for benefits under the federal
 Post-9/11 Veterans Educational Assistance Act of 2008 (38 U.S.C.
 Section 3301 et seq.) or any other federal law authorizing
 educational benefits for veterans;
 (2)  is the spouse of a person described by Subdivision
 (1); or
 (3)  is a child of a person described by Subdivision (1)
 who is 25 years of age or younger on the first day of the semester or
 other academic term for which the person is registering, except
 that the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board by rule shall
 prescribe procedures by which a person who suffered from a severe
 illness or other debilitating condition that affected the person's
 ability to use the benefit provided by this subsection before
 reaching that age may be granted additional time to use the benefit
 corresponding to the time the person was unable to use the benefit
 because of the illness or condition.
 (l) In this section, "child" includes a stepchild.
 SECTION 2. Section 54.203, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-2) to read as follows:
 (b-2)  The governing board of an institution of higher
 education shall exempt from the payment of resident tuition at the
 institution a dependent child, including a stepchild, of a member
 of the Armed Forces of the United States who is a resident of this
 state or is entitled to pay resident tuition under this subchapter,
 for any semester or other academic term during which the member of
 the armed forces is deployed on active duty for the purpose of
 engaging in a combative military operation outside the United
 States. In its appropriations to institutions of higher education,
 the legislature shall provide sufficient funds to cover the full
 costs of the exemptions provided by this subsection.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (k), Section 54.058, Education Code,
 as added by this Act, applies beginning with tuition and other fees
 charged for the 2009 fall semester. Tuition and other fees charged
 for an academic period before that semester are covered by the law
 in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. Subsection (b-2), Section 54.203, Education
 Code, as added by this Act, applies beginning with tuition charged
 for the 2009 fall semester. Tuition charged for an academic period
 before that semester is covered by the law in effect immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5. The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 shall adopt the rules required by Subdivision (3), Subsection (k),
 Section 54.058, Education Code, as added by this Act, as soon as
 practicable after this Act takes effect. For that purpose, the
 coordinating board may adopt the initial rules in the manner
 provided by law for emergency rules.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 297 passed the Senate on
 March 24, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on June 1, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 297 passed the House, with
 amendments, on April 8, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor