House | 05/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1595 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1595 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1033 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 839 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 788 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 776 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA7 Ellis | Journal Page: 753 |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Amendment adopted as amended | FA3 Lucio | Journal Page: 753 |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Amendment amended | Journal Page: 752 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Amendment to amendment offered | FA4 Carona | Journal Page: 752 |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 751 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 751 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 737 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 644 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 226 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 226 | |
Senate | 11/14/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |