House | 05/05/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2549 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2549 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2158 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1874 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1755 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1755 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1755 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1755 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA11 Nelson | Journal Page: 1755 |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 1754 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Amendment tabled | Journal Page: 1752 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 1752 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1736 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1736 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 423 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 423 | |
Senate | 03/05/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |