1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 300 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to eliminating or modifying certain mandates on school |
---|
6 | 6 | | districts. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subsection (d), Section 11.1513, Education Code, |
---|
9 | 9 | | is amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | (d) The employment policy must provide that not later than |
---|
11 | 11 | | the 10th school day before the date on which a district fills a |
---|
12 | 12 | | vacant position for which a certificate or license is required as |
---|
13 | 13 | | provided by Section 21.003, other than a position that affects the |
---|
14 | 14 | | safety and security of students as determined by the board of |
---|
15 | 15 | | trustees, the district must provide to each current district |
---|
16 | 16 | | employee: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) notice of the position by posting the position on: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (A) a bulletin board at: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (i) a place convenient to the public in the |
---|
20 | 20 | | district's central administrative office; and |
---|
21 | 21 | | (ii) the central administrative office of |
---|
22 | 22 | | each campus in the district during any time the office is open; or |
---|
23 | 23 | | [and] |
---|
24 | 24 | | (B) the district's Internet website, if the |
---|
25 | 25 | | district has a website; and |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2) a reasonable opportunity to apply for the |
---|
27 | 27 | | position. |
---|
28 | 28 | | SECTION 2. Section 25.112, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
29 | 29 | | amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections (e), (f), and (g) to |
---|
30 | 30 | | read as follows: |
---|
31 | 31 | | (d) On application of a school district, the commissioner |
---|
32 | 32 | | may except the district from the limit in Subsection (a) if the |
---|
33 | 33 | | commissioner finds the limit works an undue hardship on the |
---|
34 | 34 | | district. An exception expires at the end of the school year |
---|
35 | 35 | | [semester] for which it is granted[, and the commissioner may not |
---|
36 | 36 | | grant an exception for: |
---|
37 | 37 | | [(1) more than one semester at a time]. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (e) A school district seeking an exception under Subsection |
---|
39 | 39 | | (d) shall notify the commissioner and apply for the exception not |
---|
40 | 40 | | later than the later of: |
---|
41 | 41 | | (1) October 1; or |
---|
42 | 42 | | (2) the 30th day after the first school day the |
---|
43 | 43 | | district exceeds the limit in Subsection (a). |
---|
44 | 44 | | (f) If a school district repeatedly fails to comply with |
---|
45 | 45 | | this section, the commissioner may take any appropriate action |
---|
46 | 46 | | authorized to be taken by the commissioner under Section 39.131. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (g) Not later than January 1, 2011, the agency shall report |
---|
48 | 48 | | to the legislature the number of applications for exceptions under |
---|
49 | 49 | | Subsection (d) submitted by each school district and for each |
---|
50 | 50 | | application indicate whether the application was granted or denied. |
---|
51 | 51 | | This subsection expires February 1, 2011. |
---|
52 | 52 | | SECTION 3. Section 34.0021, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
53 | 53 | | amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsection (c-1) to |
---|
54 | 54 | | read as follows: |
---|
55 | 55 | | (a) Pursuant to the safety standards established by the |
---|
56 | 56 | | Department of Public Safety under Section 34.002, each school |
---|
57 | 57 | | district may [shall] conduct a training session for students and |
---|
58 | 58 | | teachers concerning procedures for evacuating a school bus during |
---|
59 | 59 | | an emergency. |
---|
60 | 60 | | (b) A school district that chooses to conduct a training |
---|
61 | 61 | | session under Subsection (a) is encouraged to [shall] conduct the |
---|
62 | 62 | | school bus emergency evacuation training session [at least twice |
---|
63 | 63 | | each school year, with one training session occurring] in the fall |
---|
64 | 64 | | of the school year [and one training session occurring in the |
---|
65 | 65 | | spring]. The school district is also encouraged to structure the |
---|
66 | 66 | | training session so that the session applies to school bus |
---|
67 | 67 | | passengers, a [A] portion of the [training] session occurs [must |
---|
68 | 68 | | occur] on a school bus, and the [training] session lasts [must last] |
---|
69 | 69 | | for at least one hour. |
---|
70 | 70 | | (c-1) Immediately before each field trip involving |
---|
71 | 71 | | transportation by school bus, a school district is encouraged to |
---|
72 | 72 | | review school bus emergency evacuation procedures with the school |
---|
73 | 73 | | bus passengers, including a demonstration of the school bus |
---|
74 | 74 | | emergency exits and the safe manner to exit. |
---|
75 | 75 | | SECTION 4. Section 44.902, Education Code, is amended to |
---|
76 | 76 | | read as follows: |
---|
77 | 77 | | Sec. 44.902. LONG-RANGE ENERGY PLAN [GOAL] TO REDUCE |
---|
78 | 78 | | CONSUMPTION OF ELECTRIC ENERGY. (a) The board of trustees of a |
---|
79 | 79 | | school district shall establish a long-range energy plan [goal] to |
---|
80 | 80 | | reduce the [school] district's annual electric consumption by five |
---|
81 | 81 | | percent beginning with the 2008 [each] state fiscal year and |
---|
82 | 82 | | consume electricity in subsequent fiscal years in accordance with |
---|
83 | 83 | | the district's energy plan [for six years beginning September 1, |
---|
84 | 84 | | 2007]. |
---|
85 | 85 | | (b) The plan required under Subsection (a) must include: |
---|
86 | 86 | | (1) strategies for achieving energy efficiency that: |
---|
87 | 87 | | (A) result in net savings for the district; or |
---|
88 | 88 | | (B) can be achieved without financial cost to the |
---|
89 | 89 | | district; and |
---|
90 | 90 | | (2) for each strategy identified under Subdivision |
---|
91 | 91 | | (1), the initial, short-term capital costs and lifetime costs and |
---|
92 | 92 | | savings that may result from implementation of the strategy. |
---|
93 | 93 | | (c) In determining under Subsection (b) whether a strategy |
---|
94 | 94 | | may result in financial cost to the district, the board of trustees |
---|
95 | 95 | | shall consider the total net costs and savings that may occur over |
---|
96 | 96 | | the seven-year period following implementation of the strategy. |
---|
97 | 97 | | (d) The board of trustees may submit the plan required under |
---|
98 | 98 | | Subsection (a) to the State Energy Conservation Office for the |
---|
99 | 99 | | purposes of determining whether funds available through loan |
---|
100 | 100 | | programs administered by the office are available to the district. |
---|
101 | 101 | | SECTION 5. Subsection (b), Section 44.901, Education Code, |
---|
102 | 102 | | is repealed. |
---|
103 | 103 | | SECTION 6. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010 |
---|
104 | 104 | | school year. |
---|
105 | 105 | | SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
106 | 106 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
107 | 107 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
108 | 108 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
109 | 109 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
110 | 110 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
111 | 111 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
112 | 112 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 300 passed the Senate on |
---|
113 | 113 | | March 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
114 | 114 | | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the |
---|
115 | 115 | | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
116 | 116 | | ______________________________ |
---|
117 | 117 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
118 | 118 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 300 passed the House, with |
---|
119 | 119 | | amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, |
---|
120 | 120 | | Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
121 | 121 | | ______________________________ |
---|
122 | 122 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
123 | 123 | | Approved: |
---|
124 | 124 | | ______________________________ |
---|
125 | 125 | | Date |
---|
126 | 126 | | ______________________________ |
---|
127 | 127 | | Governor |
---|