House | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 1012 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1012 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 919 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 665 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 665 |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 665 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 665 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 657 | |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 657 | |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Patrick | Journal Page: 656 |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 497 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 288 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 227 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 227 | |
Senate | 11/21/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/21/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |