House | 05/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2131 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2131 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1869 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1611 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1405 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1405 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1405 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1Zaffirini | Journal Page: 1405 |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1405 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1405 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 329 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |