Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Point of order sustained
|
|
Journal Page: 5135
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 5135
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Motion to adopt conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5135
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5043
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1650
|
Journal Page: 6447
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6447
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4870
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4672
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4672
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6009
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6009
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6028
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6028
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6028
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4550
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4550
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 4550
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4550
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4532
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1309
|
Journal Page: 4940
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4940
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4940
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4588
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Otto
|
Journal Page: 4588
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4588
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4286
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1066
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 842
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 842
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 842
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 842
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 842
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 842
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 842
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 227
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 227
|
Senate
|
11/21/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|