Senate | 05/26/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 1955 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | Journal Page: 1955 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1484 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Motion to suspend regular order fails | Journal Page: 1484 | |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 654 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 497 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 227 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 227 | |
Senate | 11/21/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/21/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |