House | 05/19/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 1265 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1265 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 756 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 229 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 229 | |
Senate | 12/05/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/05/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |