House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 2864 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2864 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2430 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1997 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1892 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1892 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1892 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1892 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1825 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1825 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1824 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 230 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 230 | |
Senate | 12/08/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/08/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |