1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 343 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the creation of an advisory committee to study the |
---|
6 | 6 | | retail availability of healthy foods in certain underserved areas |
---|
7 | 7 | | of this state. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. HEALTHY FOOD ADVISORY COMMITTEE. (a) The |
---|
10 | 10 | | executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission |
---|
11 | 11 | | and the commissioner of the Department of Agriculture shall jointly |
---|
12 | 12 | | establish an advisory committee to study and provide |
---|
13 | 13 | | recommendations to the legislature regarding: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) the areas of this state that are underserved in the |
---|
15 | 15 | | retail availability of fresh fruits and vegetables and other |
---|
16 | 16 | | healthy foods; and |
---|
17 | 17 | | (2) the impact of the limited retail availability on |
---|
18 | 18 | | proper nutrition and on obesity and related chronic illnesses. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (b) The advisory committee consists of eight members as |
---|
20 | 20 | | follows: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (1) four members appointed by the executive |
---|
22 | 22 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission; and |
---|
23 | 23 | | (2) four members appointed by the commissioner of the |
---|
24 | 24 | | Department of Agriculture. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (c) In appointing members of the advisory committee, the |
---|
26 | 26 | | executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission |
---|
27 | 27 | | and the commissioner of the Department of Agriculture shall ensure |
---|
28 | 28 | | that the members reflect the diversity of this state, with members |
---|
29 | 29 | | representing: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (1) rural areas; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (2) urban areas; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (3) different geographical regions of the state. |
---|
33 | 33 | | (d) An advisory committee member is not entitled to |
---|
34 | 34 | | reimbursement of expenses or to compensation. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (e) The advisory committee shall meet not later than the |
---|
36 | 36 | | 30th day after the date the initial appointments are made and shall |
---|
37 | 37 | | select a presiding officer. The committee shall meet regularly as |
---|
38 | 38 | | necessary at the call of the presiding officer. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (f) The advisory committee shall: |
---|
40 | 40 | | (1) investigate the retail availability of fresh |
---|
41 | 41 | | fruits and vegetables and other healthy foods in this state; |
---|
42 | 42 | | (2) develop recommendations for creating and a plan |
---|
43 | 43 | | for implementing a statewide financing program to bring fresh food |
---|
44 | 44 | | retailers into areas of this state that are underserved in regard to |
---|
45 | 45 | | the retail availability of fresh fruits and vegetables and other |
---|
46 | 46 | | healthy foods; and |
---|
47 | 47 | | (3) perform other advisory duties as requested by the |
---|
48 | 48 | | executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission |
---|
49 | 49 | | or the commissioner of the Department of Agriculture regarding the |
---|
50 | 50 | | availability of fresh fruits and vegetables and other healthy foods |
---|
51 | 51 | | in this state. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (g) Not later than September 1, 2010, the advisory committee |
---|
53 | 53 | | shall submit to the legislature a report outlining: |
---|
54 | 54 | | (1) the costs, benefits, and feasibility of a |
---|
55 | 55 | | statewide financing program to bring fresh food retailers into |
---|
56 | 56 | | areas of this state that are underserved in regard to the retail |
---|
57 | 57 | | availability of fresh fruits and vegetables and other healthy |
---|
58 | 58 | | foods; and |
---|
59 | 59 | | (2) a plan for implementing the program. |
---|
60 | 60 | | SECTION 2. INAPPLICABILITY OF CERTAIN LAW. Chapter 2110, |
---|
61 | 61 | | Government Code, does not apply to the advisory committee |
---|
62 | 62 | | established under this Act. |
---|
63 | 63 | | SECTION 3. EXPIRATION. The advisory committee established |
---|
64 | 64 | | under this Act is abolished and this Act expires September 1, 2011. |
---|
65 | 65 | | SECTION 4. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
66 | 66 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
67 | 67 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
68 | 68 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
69 | 69 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
70 | 70 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
71 | 71 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
72 | 72 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 343 passed the Senate on |
---|
73 | 73 | | March 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
74 | 74 | | ______________________________ |
---|
75 | 75 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
76 | 76 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 343 passed the House on |
---|
77 | 77 | | May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 8, one |
---|
78 | 78 | | present not voting. |
---|
79 | 79 | | ______________________________ |
---|
80 | 80 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
81 | 81 | | Approved: |
---|
82 | 82 | | ______________________________ |
---|
83 | 83 | | Date |
---|
84 | 84 | | ______________________________ |
---|
85 | 85 | | Governor |
---|