E | 05/05/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/05/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2050 | |
E | 04/27/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1661 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1923 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1616 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1661 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1484 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Record vote | RV#284 | Journal Page: 1792 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1792 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1792 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1751 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1751 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2382 | Journal Page: 1751 |
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1066 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 842 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 842 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 842 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 842 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 842 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 842 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 842 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 610 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 230 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 230 | |
Senate | 12/08/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/08/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |