E | 05/13/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/13/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2395 | |
E | 05/06/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2097 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2670 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2064 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2097 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 2551 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2013 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 2013 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 2013 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2013 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 1722 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | RV#386 | Journal Page: 1992 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1992 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1992 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 1911 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Amended | 1-Kolkhorst | Journal Page: 1911 |
House | 04/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1911 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2383 | Journal Page: 1911 |
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1012 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1012 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 808 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 604 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 604 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 604 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 604 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 604 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 604 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 604 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 438 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 230 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 230 | |
Senate | 12/08/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/08/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |