Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB358 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Patrick S.B. No. 358
 (In the Senate - Filed December 12, 2008; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; April 29, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 4; April 29, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 358 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the enforcement of state and federal laws governing
 immigration by certain governmental entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 370.003, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 370.003. LOCAL GOVERNMENT [MUNICIPAL OR COUNTY] POLICY
 REGARDING ENFORCEMENT OF STATE AND FEDERAL [DRUG] LAWS. (a) The
 governing body of a municipality, [the commissioners court of a]
 county, or special district or authority, or an officer, employee,
 or other body that is part of a municipality, county, or special
 district or authority, including a sheriff, municipal police
 department, municipal attorney, county attorney, district
 attorney, or criminal district attorney, may not adopt a policy
 under which the entity will not fully enforce the laws of this state
 or federal law relating to:
 (1) drugs, including Chapters 481 and 483, Health and
 Safety Code; and
 (2)  immigrants or immigration, including the federal
 Immigration and Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. Section 1373)[, and
 federal law].
 (b)  In compliance with Subsection (a)(2), a local entity
 described by Subsection (a) may not prohibit or in any manner
 restrict an officer, employee, or other body that is part of the
 local entity, including a sheriff, municipal police department,
 municipal attorney, county attorney, district attorney, or
 criminal district attorney, from, with respect to information
 relating to the immigration status, lawful or unlawful, of any
 individual:
 (1)  sending the information to or requesting or
 receiving the information from the United States Bureau of
 Citizenship and Immigration Services or United States Immigration
 and Customs Enforcement, including information regarding an
 individual's place of birth;
 (2) maintaining the information; or
 (3)  exchanging the information with another federal,
 state, or local governmental entity.
 (c)  In addition to requirements imposed by Subsection (b), a
 local entity described by Subsection (a) may not prohibit or in any
 manner restrict an officer, employee, or other body that is part of
 the local entity, including a sheriff, municipal police department,
 municipal attorney, county attorney, district attorney, or
 criminal district attorney, from doing any of the following:
 (1)  assisting or cooperating with a federal
 immigration officer as reasonable and necessary, including
 providing enforcement assistance; or
 (2)  permitting a federal immigration officer to enter
 and conduct enforcement activities at a municipal or county jail to
 enforce federal immigration laws.
 (d)  A local entity described by Subsection (a) may not
 receive state grant funds if the local entity adopts a rule, order,
 ordinance, or policy under which the local entity violates
 Subsection (c) or will not fully enforce the laws of this state or
 federal laws relating to Subsection (a)(2) or, by consistent
 actions, violates Subsection (c) or fails to fully enforce the laws
 of this state or federal laws relating to Subsection (a)(2). State
 grant funds for the local entity shall be denied for the fiscal year
 following the year in which the rule, order, ordinance, or policy is
 adopted or the determination is made that the entity has
 intentionally violated Subsection (c) or failed to fully enforce
 the laws of this state or federal laws relating to Subsection
 (a)(2). The Governor's Office of Budget, Planning, and Policy
 shall adopt rules to implement this subsection uniformly among the
 state agencies from which state grant funds are distributed to a
 local entity.
 (e)  Any citizen residing in a local entity described by
 Subsection (a) that allegedly adopts a rule, order, ordinance, or
 policy under which the local entity violates Subsection (c) or will
 not fully enforce the laws of this state or federal laws relating to
 Subsection (a)(2) or, by consistent actions, violates Subsection
 (c) or fails to fully enforce the laws of this state or federal laws
 relating to Subsection (a)(2) may file a petition in a district
 court of a county in which the entity is located for a writ of
 mandamus to compel compliance with Subsection (c) or Subsection
 (a)(2).
 SECTION 2. The heading to Chapter 370, Local Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 370. MISCELLANEOUS PROVISIONS RELATING TO [MUNICIPAL AND
 COUNTY] HEALTH AND PUBLIC SAFETY APPLYING TO MORE THAN ONE
 TYPE OF LOCAL GOVERNMENT
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *