E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6035
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4611
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4611
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4611
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4607
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1310
|
Journal Page: 4941
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4941
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4941
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4606
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Amended
|
1-W. Smith
|
Journal Page: 4606
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4606
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4286
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1266
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1266
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1169
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Jackson
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 366
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Refer to s/c on Flooding & Evacuations by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 254
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 254
|
Senate
|
12/15/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|