House
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2131
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2131
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1763
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 255
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 255
|
Senate
|
12/15/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|