S.B. No. 379 AN ACT relating to the duties of the Texas Fusion Center, including an annual report by the center regarding criminal street gangs. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 421.082, Government Code, is amended by adding Subsections (e), (f), and (g) to read as follows: (e) The gang section of the center shall annually submit to the governor and the legislature a report assessing the threat posed statewide by criminal street gangs. The report must include identification of: (1) law enforcement strategies that have been proven effective in deterring gang-related crime; and (2) gang involvement in trafficking of persons. (f) On request, the office of the attorney general, the Department of Public Safety, the Texas Department of Criminal Justice, other law enforcement agencies, and juvenile justice agencies of this state shall provide to the gang section of the center information relating to criminal street gangs, gang-related crime, and gang involvement in trafficking of persons. (g) Any information received by the center under this section that is stored, combined with other information, analyzed, or disseminated is subject to the rules governing criminal intelligence in 28 C.F.R. Part 23. SECTION 2. The gang section of the Texas Fusion Center shall submit the first annual report regarding criminal street gangs to the governor and the legislature as required by Subsection (e), Section 421.082, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than September 1, 2010. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 379 passed the Senate on April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; May 30, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 379 passed the House, with amendment, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, one present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor