1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 379 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the duties of the Texas Fusion Center, including an |
---|
6 | 6 | | annual report by the center regarding criminal street gangs. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 421.082, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 9 | | adding Subsections (e), (f), and (g) to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | (e) The gang section of the center shall annually submit to |
---|
11 | 11 | | the governor and the legislature a report assessing the threat |
---|
12 | 12 | | posed statewide by criminal street gangs. The report must include |
---|
13 | 13 | | identification of: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) law enforcement strategies that have been proven |
---|
15 | 15 | | effective in deterring gang-related crime; and |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) gang involvement in trafficking of persons. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (f) On request, the office of the attorney general, the |
---|
18 | 18 | | Department of Public Safety, the Texas Department of Criminal |
---|
19 | 19 | | Justice, other law enforcement agencies, and juvenile justice |
---|
20 | 20 | | agencies of this state shall provide to the gang section of the |
---|
21 | 21 | | center information relating to criminal street gangs, gang-related |
---|
22 | 22 | | crime, and gang involvement in trafficking of persons. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (g) Any information received by the center under this |
---|
24 | 24 | | section that is stored, combined with other information, analyzed, |
---|
25 | 25 | | or disseminated is subject to the rules governing criminal |
---|
26 | 26 | | intelligence in 28 C.F.R. Part 23. |
---|
27 | 27 | | SECTION 2. The gang section of the Texas Fusion Center shall |
---|
28 | 28 | | submit the first annual report regarding criminal street gangs to |
---|
29 | 29 | | the governor and the legislature as required by Subsection (e), |
---|
30 | 30 | | Section 421.082, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later |
---|
31 | 31 | | than September 1, 2010. |
---|
32 | 32 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
33 | 33 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
34 | 34 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
35 | 35 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
36 | 36 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
37 | 37 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
38 | 38 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
39 | 39 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 379 passed the Senate on |
---|
40 | 40 | | April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; |
---|
41 | 41 | | May 30, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and |
---|
42 | 42 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House |
---|
43 | 43 | | granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
44 | 44 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
45 | 45 | | Nays 0. |
---|
46 | 46 | | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | 47 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
48 | 48 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 379 passed the House, with |
---|
49 | 49 | | amendment, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, |
---|
50 | 50 | | Nays 0, one present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted request |
---|
51 | 51 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
52 | 52 | | May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
53 | 53 | | following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, two present not voting. |
---|
54 | 54 | | ______________________________ |
---|
55 | 55 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
56 | 56 | | Approved: |
---|
57 | 57 | | ______________________________ |
---|
58 | 58 | | Date |
---|
59 | 59 | | ______________________________ |
---|
60 | 60 | | Governor |
---|