House
|
05/27/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 5107
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5107
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 5024
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Vaught
|
Journal Page: 5023
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5023
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4354
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2426
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2426
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2209
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 257
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 257
|
Senate
|
12/19/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|