E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4975
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5981
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4241
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4241
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4241
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4241
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3982
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#957
|
Journal Page: 3982
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3982
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3982
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Zerwas
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1124
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 1011
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1011
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 885
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 699
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 497
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 384
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 185
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 185
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 168
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|