Senate | 05/08/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1711 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 257 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 257 | |
Senate | 12/31/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/31/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |