House | 05/14/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3679 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1299 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Lucio | Journal Page: 1187 |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1186 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1186 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 258 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 258 | |
Senate | 01/05/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/05/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |