By: Carona S.B. No. 404 (In the Senate - Filed January 6, 2009; February 17, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security; March 30, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1; March 30, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 404 By: Carona A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the authority of certain toll project entities to enter into a comprehensive development agreement. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subsections (f) and (i), Section 223.201, Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows: (f) Except as provided by Subsections (h) and (i), the authority to enter into comprehensive development agreements provided by this section expires on August 31, 2015 [2009]. (i) The authority to enter into a comprehensive development agreement for a project exempted from Subsection (f) or Section 223.210(b) expires August 31, 2017 [2011]. SECTION 2. Subsections (d) and (f), Section 370.305, Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows: (d) Except as provided by Subsections (e) and (f), the authority to enter into comprehensive development agreements under this section expires on August 31, 2015 [2009]. (f) The authority to enter into a comprehensive development agreement for a project exempted from Subsection (d) or Section 223.210(b) expires August 31, 2017 [2011]. SECTION 3. Except as provided by Section 4 of this Act, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect only if Senate Bill No. 17 or another similar bill of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, relating to the design, development, financing, construction, and operation of certain toll projects including the determination of the primacy process for local toll entities becomes law. If Senate Bill No. 17 or another similar bill of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, relating to the design, development, financing, construction, and operation of certain toll projects including the determination of the primacy process for local toll entities does not become law, this Act has no effect. * * * * *