E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6970
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5078
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5078
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1089
|
Journal Page: 5069
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5043
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6516
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1666
|
Journal Page: 6515
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6515
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2968
|
Journal Page: 6505
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4883
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5288
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5288
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5978
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5978
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5978
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4126
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4126
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 4126
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4126
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4123
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2636
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4094
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#986
|
Journal Page: 4094
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4094
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Naishtat
|
Journal Page: 4092
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4092
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4026
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Naishtat
|
Journal Page: 4025
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4025
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/19/09 4:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4006
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4006
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1204
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1204
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1067
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 642
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 259
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 259
|
Senate
|
01/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|