Senate | 05/04/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1939 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1072 | |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 644 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 500 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 185 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 185 | |
Senate | 02/03/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 129 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |