House | 05/13/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3411 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3434 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3434 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2687 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2193 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2100 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2100 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2100 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2100 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2100 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2100 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2100 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1711 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 259 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 259 | |
Senate | 01/06/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |